open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00628
    Party Name:Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment v. TAP Worldwide
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Propose Schedule]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Standing Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116467
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =