open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00948
    Party Name:DP Creations et al v. Ortiz et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Email Filing and Notification]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Email Filing]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Modifying Referral]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Counsel]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Decision]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disqualify Counsel]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Update Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Propose Schedule]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117798
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =