open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-28868
    Party Name:Silas Soida Wangia
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Chapter 7 Trustee's Request for Creditors to File Claims (NO IMAGE)]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Discharging Debtor(s) (order) (AUTO)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (FEE)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Financial Management Course Certificate Form 423]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Show Cause For Nonpayment of Filing Fees (INSTALLMENTS ONLY) (order)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Receipt of Installment Payment - Chapter 7 (FEE)]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Motion)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Debtor's Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?436375
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =