open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-28986
    Party Name:Patrick Jacobsen
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Declaration Re Claims Review]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (order)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Trustee's Withdrawal of Document (NO IMAGE)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Minute Entry.Confirmation Hearing Stricken]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Continuing Confirmation Hearing (order)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Pending Order]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Minute Entry Continued - Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Preconfirmation Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Continuing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Amended Schedules/List of Creditors/Statements (Dec 1 2016)]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Certificate of Service Re: Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (FEE)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?436497
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =