open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-28990
    Party Name:Korbin L. Murphy and Nicole C. Murphy
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Electronically Paid Fee - INSTALLMENTS (FINAL)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1 Supp)]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Electronically Paid Fee - INSTALLMENTS (INTERIM)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Motion)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?436501
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =