open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-28988
    Party Name:Lancelot Thomas Draper
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Trustee Voucher]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 7,12 &13)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Discharging Debtor(s) (order) (AUTO)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (FEE)]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Chapter 7 (FEE)]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1 Supp)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Motion)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?436499
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =