open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:20-21959
    Party Name:Paul M. Westgate
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Certificate of Service Re: Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Declaration/Affidavit Re: Tax Returns]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Preconfirmation Adequate Protection (Initial or Amended)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:March 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings]
    Date Published:March 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Clerk's Notice of Possible Previous Discharge]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Deficiencies (13)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (FEE)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?439009
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =