U.S. District Court for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00397-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitehouse
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 16, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 04, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 02, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.