open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:20-24650
    Party Name:Judith Ann Burkhead
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Certificate of Service Re: Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (With Image)]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Declaration/Affidavit Re: Tax Returns]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Motion)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (FEE)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?441775
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =