open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:20-24806
    Party Name:Rachel Crawford Brooks
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Reaffirmation Agreement (Limited filer)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Objection]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Trustee/USTR's Recommendation for Dismissal]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [*Notice and Opportunity for Hearing]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Continue Hearing (Motion)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1 Supp)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?441933
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =