open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:20-25582
    Party Name:Stefany P Palmer, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1 Supp)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hofmann, tr George B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Motion)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?442729
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =