open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:20-25607
    Party Name:Kenneth Xerik Shaw, III and Madeline Nicole Altevogt
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice]
    Date Published:October 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Request for Creditors to File Claims (NO IMAGE)]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:October 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Electronically Paid Fee - INSTALLMENTS (INTERIM)]
    Date Published:October 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1 Supp)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Motion)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?442754
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =