open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:20-25606
    Party Name:Rodney Gerald Goodman
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thomson, Michael F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thomson, Michael F. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thomson, Michael F. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thomson, Michael F. [Debtor's Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thomson, Michael F. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Filing Fee Paid - Voluntary Petition (FEE)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Clerk's Notice of No Provided SS Number]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bird, tr J. Kevin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?442753
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =