U.S. District Court for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mc-00239
  • Case Name: In Re 7660 in US Currency Seized on 11/20/2020, Judicial Forfeiture Proceedings Involving
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.