U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Padilla
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order for Exam]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 06, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 06, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.