U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00365-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jabbah
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 17, 2023: [Petition and Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2022: [Petition and Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [U-ACT Ineligible Participant Order]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 08, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 08, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.