U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00431-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 04, 2022: [Petition and Order]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.