U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Michel-Barraza et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Re-Appoint Counsel]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2023: [Re-Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 23, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Strike]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Re-Appoint Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 19, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.