U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00376-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamilton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Release Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Release Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 12, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 12, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • October 12, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.