U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. York
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order and Report on Offender Under Supervision]
  • December 21, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 16, 2021: [Furlough]
  • December 14, 2021: [Petition and Order]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 21, 2021: [Petition and Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 13, 2021: [Petition and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.