U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00429-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Araujo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Petition and Order]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2021: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.