U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00426-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Varela
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 10, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 14, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.