U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00435-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 15, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.