U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00424-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Perez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Withdrawing Warrant]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant]
  • October 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 20, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.