U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00437-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Butts-Vasquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Release Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.