U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00405-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wyman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.