U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00440-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Becerra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 21, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.