U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00369-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 11, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Review of Detention]
  • November 01, 2021: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 27, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 22, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.