U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00390-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cameron
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Review of Detention]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • December 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [Review of Detention]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 27, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.