U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 28, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.