U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00425-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Strickland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 16, 2022: [Furlough]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 02, 2022: [Furlough]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 11, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 11, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.