U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Atchley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Protective Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 29, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.