U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00455-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santos-Ontiveros
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Re-Appoint Counsel]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Re-Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Exclude]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Brady Order]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.