U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00447-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Munster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Exclude]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • December 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.