U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00388-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ryans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 06, 2022: [Petition and Order]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 19, 2022: [Strike]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • November 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 01, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.