U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00413-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguilar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Produce]
  • January 19, 2023: [U-ACT Ineligible Participant Order]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 24, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2021: [Petition and Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.