U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00450-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 22, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Associate/Consolidate Cases]
  • November 04, 2021: [Associate/Consolidate Cases]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.