U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00460-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Strader et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 12, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Furlough]
  • June 07, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 02, 2022: [Unseal Case]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention by District Judge]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Petition and Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 24, 2021: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 16, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 11, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 11, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 11, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 11, 2021: [Discovery]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.