U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Old Rock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Release Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Release Order]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Petition and Order]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Release Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Review of Detention]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.