U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dail Leroy Brady
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 08, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.