U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00438-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sathaphan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
  • November 07, 2022: [Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Furlough]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 06, 2022: [Furlough]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 27, 2022: [Furlough]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.