U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jason William Dittmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 07, 2022: [Strike]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.