U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jose Abraham Duenas Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.