U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dillon Stuart Haddenham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 28, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 12, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.