U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00436-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2022: [Review of Detention]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
  • June 13, 2022: [Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Petition and Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.