U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00459-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meredith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.