U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00470-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Danvers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 15, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 05, 2021: [Detention]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.