U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Ortiz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Dismissal]
  • July 13, 2022: [Leave to File Dismissal per Rule 48(a)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2022: [Strike]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Separate Trial on Counts]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • March 23, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Joinder]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 29, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 28, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 28, 2021: [Separate Trial on Counts]
  • December 28, 2021: [Sever Defendant]
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 23, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.