U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00479-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moreno-Guarneros
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.