U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00475-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • November 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.